Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB95 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Engrossed

Bill February 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 4, 2021