Senate | 04/18/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Hill | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 7 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Dills (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Haste |