Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB968 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 12, 2022

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021