Senate | 04/13/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/13/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Brooks |