Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB97 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 8, 2021

Amended

Bill March 24, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021