Senate | 06/02/2023 | Becomes law without Governor's signature 06/02/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Notice to reconsider waived | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Martinez | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | JCR adopted | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Emergency removed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Martinez | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Hall | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |