Oklahoma 2023 1st Special Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB31 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2023

                             
 
 
An Act 
ENROLLED SENATE 
BILL NO. 31x 	By: Thompson (Roger) and Hall 
of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Martinez of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Historical Society; 
requiring that certain appropriated funds be used for 
certain purposes; directing certain transfer; 
providing for lapse of funds under certain 
conditions; and requiring and prohibiting certain 
budget procedures. 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT:  Oklahoma Historical Society 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF TH E STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropr iated to the Oklahoma 
Historical Society in Enrolled House Bill No. 1004 of the 1st 
Extraordinary Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the Oklahoma 
Historical Society is hereby authorized to expend Two Hundred Four 
Thousand Dollars ($204,000.00) for increased aid to affiliate sites 
across the state. These funds shall be in addition to previous 
years’ budgeted funds, and sha ll not be used to supplant such funds. 
 
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropr iated to the Oklahoma 
Historical Society in Enrolled House Bill No. 1004 of the 1st 
Extraordinary Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the Oklahoma 
Historical Society is hereby authorized to expend Five Million 
Dollars ($5,000,000.00) for operations to the Native American 
Cultural and Educational Authority for fiscal years 2024 and 2025. 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 31x 	Page 2 
SECTION 3. From the funds appropr iated to the Oklahoma 
Historical Society in Enrolled House Bill No. 1004 of the 1st 
Extraordinary Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the Oklahoma 
Historical Society shall transfer Eighteen Million Dollars 
($18,000,000.00) to the Oklahoma Museum of Popular Culture 
Supplemental Revolvin g Fund, created in Enrolled Senate B ill No. 22 
of the 1st Extraordinary Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature. 
 
SECTION 4.  Appropriations made to the Oklahoma Historical 
Society by Enrolled House Bill No. 1004 of the 1st Extraordinary 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purp oses, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024 (hereafter FY-24), or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025 (hereafter FY-25).  
Funds budgeted for FY-24 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2024, and must be expended by November 15, 2024.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2024, and not budgeted for F Y-25, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then curre nt fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY -25 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2025. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2025, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. 
These appropriations shall not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY-24, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, ma y be budgeted for FY-25, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-24 budget work program and after such revision ha s been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 31x 	Page 3 
Passed the Senate the 24th day of May, 2023. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the 26th day of May, 2023. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this _______ _____________ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this _______ ___ 
day of __________________, 20 _______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __