House | 04/26/2023 | SA's received | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 23 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Provenzano | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Rosecrants |