Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1035 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023