Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Hicks (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Hasenbeck |