House
|
05/02/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Remove Representative Williams as principal House author and substitute with Representative Banning
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Williams
|
|
|