LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1789
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma House Bill HB1789
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session
Oklahoma House Bill HB1789
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 18, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 27, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 27, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 17, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 28, 2023
Compare