Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1894 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2023