House
|
04/24/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/21/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Cantrell
|
|
|