Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1897 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023