Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 8 | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Sims |