Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023