House
|
05/01/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Boatman
|
|
|