Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2036 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 6, 2023