House
|
05/01/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/01/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Hardin
|
|
|