Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2057 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2023