House
|
05/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 35
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Standridge
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, McDugle, Banning, Tedford, George, Hardin, Grego, Williams, Manger, Patzkowsky, Luttrell, May
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Pederson; authored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Ford
|
|
|