Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2153 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2023

Amended

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023