Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Rosino; authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Remove Representative Ford as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hilbert
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Ford
|
|
|