House
|
05/02/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McBride, ODonnell
|
|
|