Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2561 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2023