House
|
05/02/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Seifried
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Thompson (Kristen)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Baker
|
|
|