Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Deck | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Hefner |