House
|
05/25/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hefner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Fugate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 73 Nays: 23
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Vetoed 04/26/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Administrative Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Kendrix
|
|
|