Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2820 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-An Act
2-ENROLLED HOUSE
1+
2+
3+SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2820 SFLR Page 1
4+(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
5+2
6+3
7+4
8+5
9+6
10+7
11+8
12+9
13+10
14+11
15+12
16+13
17+14
18+15
19+16
20+17
21+18
22+19
23+20
24+21
25+22
26+23
27+24
28+
29+SENATE FLOOR VERSION
30+April 12, 2023
31+
32+
33+ENGROSSED HOUSE
334 BILL NO. 2820 By: Kendrix of the House
435
536 and
637
738 Bergstrom of the Senate
8-
9-
1039
1140
1241
1342
1443 An Act relating to sunset; amending 70 O.S. 2021,
1544 Section 23-105, which relates to the Oklahoma
1645 Educational Television Authority; re-creating the
1746 authority; and modifying termination date.
1847
1948
2049
2150
22-SUBJECT: Sunset
23-
2451 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
25-
2652 SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 70 O.S. 2021, Section 23 -105, is
2753 amended to read as follows:
28-
2954 Section 23-105. There is hereby re-created, to continue until
3055 July 1, 2023 2026, in accordance with the provisions of the Oklahoma
3156 Sunset Law, Section 3901 et seq. of Title 74 of the Oklahoma
3257 Statutes, a body corporate and politic to be kn own as the "Oklahoma
3358 Educational Television Authority", and by that name the Authority
3459 may sue and be sued, and plead and be impleaded. The Authority is
3560 hereby constituted an instrumentality of the state, and the exerci se
3661 by the Authority of the powers co nferred by this article for the
3762 planning, construction, opera tion, and maintenance of educational
63+
64+SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2820 SFLR Page 2
65+(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
66+2
67+3
68+4
69+5
70+6
71+7
72+8
73+9
74+10
75+11
76+12
77+13
78+14
79+15
80+16
81+17
82+18
83+19
84+20
85+21
86+22
87+23
88+24
89+
3890 television facilities shall be deemed and held to be an essential
3991 function of the state.
40-
4192 The Oklahoma Educational Televisi on Authority shall consist of
4293 thirteen (13) members, including the President of the University of
4394 Oklahoma, the President of Oklahoma State University, the State
4495 Superintendent of Public Instruction, the Chancell or of the Oklahoma
4596 State Regents for Higher Education, the president of one of t he
46-state-supported four-year colleges to be chosen by the presidents of ENR. H. B. NO. 2820 Page 2
97+state-supported four-year colleges to be chosen by the pre sidents of
4798 this group of institutions, the president of one of the state -
4899 supported two-year colleges to be chosen b y the presidents of this
49100 group of institutions, and seven additional members to be appointed
50101 by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate, to serve
51102 seven-year terms.
52-
53103 The appointed members shall have been residents of the state for
54104 at least five (5) years preceding the date of their appointment.
55105 The appointed members shall inclu de one member from each of the
56106 congressional districts and any remaining members shall be appointed
57107 from the state at large. However, when congressional districts are
58108 redrawn each member appointed prior to July 1 of the yea r in which
59109 such modification bec omes effective shall complete the current term
60110 of office and appointments made after July 1 of the year in which
61111 such modification becomes effective shall be based on th e redrawn
62112 districts. Appointments made after July 1 of the year in which such
63113 modification becomes effective shall be from any redrawn distr icts
114+
115+SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2820 SFLR Page 3
116+(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
117+2
118+3
119+4
120+5
121+6
122+7
123+8
124+9
125+10
126+11
127+12
128+13
129+14
130+15
131+16
132+17
133+18
134+19
135+20
136+21
137+22
138+23
139+24
140+
64141 which are not represented by a board an authority member until such
65142 time as each of the modified congressional districts are represented
66143 by a board an authority member. A majority of the app ointed members
67144 shall be actively engaged in the profession o f education. Each
68145 appointed member of the Autho rity, before entering upon the duties
69146 of the member, shall take the oath provided for by Section 1 of
70147 Article XV of the Constitution of the State of Oklahoma.
71-
72148 The seven original members appointed by the Gover nor shall
73149 continue in office for terms expiring on June 30, 1954; June 30,
74150 1955; June 30, 1956; June 30, 1957; June 30, 1958; June 30, 1959;
75151 and June 30, 1960, respectively. The terms of each of the original
76152 appointed members shall be designated by the Go vernor, and said
77153 members shall serve for their a ppointed terms and until their
78154 respective successors shall be appoi nted and qualified. The
79155 successor of each appointed member shall be appointed fo r a term of
80156 seven (7) years, except that any person appointe d to fill a vacancy
81157 shall be appointed to serve only for the unexpired term in said
82158 vacancy.
83-
84159 The Authority shall el ect from the membership of the Authority a
85160 chairman chair, a vice-chairman vice-chair, and a secretary-
86161 treasurer. Any such officers elected by the Authority on or after
87162 July 1, 1984, shall be appointed to serve a term of one (1) year.
88163 Seven members of the Authority shall constitute a quorum, and the
89164 vote of seven members shall be necessary for any action taken by the
165+
166+SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2820 SFLR Page 4
167+(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
168+2
169+3
170+4
171+5
172+6
173+7
174+8
175+9
176+10
177+11
178+12
179+13
180+14
181+15
182+16
183+17
184+18
185+19
186+20
187+21
188+22
189+23
190+24
191+
90192 Authority. No vacancy in the membership of the Authority shall
91-impair the right of a quor um to exercise all the rights and perform ENR. H. B. NO. 2820 Page 3
193+impair the right of a quor um to exercise all the rights and perform
92194 all the duties of the Authority. The Authority shall meet at least
93195 quarterly.
94-
95196 The members of the Authority shall not be entitled to
96197 compensation for their services, but each member shall be reimbursed
97198 for travel expenses incurred in performing official duties in
98199 accordance with the provisions of the State Travel Reimbursement
99200 Act. No liability or obligation shall be incurred by the Authority
100201 beyond the extent to which monies shall have been provided pursuant
101202 to the authority of this article.
102- ENR. H. B. NO. 2820 Page 4
103-Passed the House of Representatives the 7th day of March, 2023.
104-
105-
106-
107-
108- Presiding Officer of the House
109- of Representatives
110-
111-
112-
113-Passed the Senate the 19th day of April, 2023.
114-
115-
116-
117-
118- Presiding Officer of the Senate
119-
120-
121-
122-OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR
123-Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________
124-day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
125-By: _________________________________
126-Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____
127-day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
128-
129-
130- _________________________________
131- Governor of the State of Oklahoma
132-
133-OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE
134-Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________
135-day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
136-By: _________________________________
203+COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON ADMINISTRATIVE RULES
204+April 12, 2023 - DO PASS