Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2820 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/20/2023

                            An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2820 	By: Kendrix of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Bergstrom of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to sunset; amending 70 O.S. 2021, 
Section 23-105, which relates to the Oklahoma 
Educational Television Authority ; re-creating the 
authority; and modifying termination date. 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Sunset 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     70 O.S. 2021, Section 23 -105, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 23-105. There is hereby re-created, to continue until 
July 1, 2023 2026, in accordance with the provisions of the Oklahoma 
Sunset Law, Section 3901 et seq. of Title 74 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes, a body corporate and politic to be kn own as the "Oklahoma 
Educational Television Authority", and by that name the Authority 
may sue and be sued, and plead and be impleaded.  The Authority is 
hereby constituted an instrumentality of the state, and the exerci se 
by the Authority of the powers co nferred by this article for the 
planning, construction, operation, and maintenance of educational 
television facilities shall be deemed and held to be an essential 
function of the state. 
 
The Oklahoma Educational Televisi on Authority shall consist of 
thirteen (13) members, including the Presiden t of the University of 
Oklahoma, the President of Oklahoma State University, the State 
Superintendent of Public Instruction, the Chancell or of the Oklahoma 
State Regents for Higher Education, the president of one of t he 
state-supported four-year colleges to be chosen by the presidents of  ENR. H. B. NO. 2820 	Page 2 
this group of institutions, the president of one of the state -
supported two-year colleges to be chosen b y the presidents of this 
group of institutions, and seven additional members to be appointed 
by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate, to serve 
seven-year terms. 
 
The appointed members shall have been residents of the state for 
at least five (5) years preceding the date of their appointment.  
The appointed members shall inclu de one member from each of the 
congressional districts and any remaining members shall be appointed 
from the state at large.  However, when congressional districts are 
redrawn each member appointed prior to July 1 of the yea r in which 
such modification bec omes effective shall complete t he current term 
of office and appointments made after July 1 of the year in which 
such modification becomes effective shall be based on th e redrawn 
districts.  Appointments made after July 1 of the year in which such 
modification becomes effective shall be from any redrawn districts 
which are not represented by a board an authority member until such 
time as each of the modified congressional districts are represented 
by a board an authority member.  A majority of the app ointed members 
shall be actively eng aged in the profession of education.  Each 
appointed member of the Autho rity, before entering upon the duties 
of the member, shall take the oath provided for by Section 1 of 
Article XV of the Constitution of the State of Oklahoma. 
 
The seven original member s appointed by the Governor shall 
continue in office for terms expiring on June 30, 1954; June 30, 
1955; June 30, 1956; June 30, 1957; June 30, 1958; June 30, 1959; 
and June 30, 1960, respectively.  The terms of each of the original 
appointed members shall be designated by the Governor, and said 
members shall serve for their a ppointed terms and until their 
respective successors shall be appoi nted and qualified.  The 
successor of each appointed member shall be appointed fo r a term of 
seven (7) years, except that any person appointed to fill a vacancy 
shall be appointed to serve only for the unexpired term in said 
vacancy. 
 
The Authority shall el ect from the membership of the Authority a 
chairman chair, a vice-chairman vice-chair, and a secretary-
treasurer.  Any such officers elected by the Authority on or after 
July 1, 1984, shall be appointed to serve a term of one (1) year.  
Seven members of the Authority shall constitute a quorum, and the 
vote of seven members shall be necessary for any action taken by the 
Authority.  No vacancy in the membership of the Authority shall 
impair the right of a quor um to exercise all the rights and perform  ENR. H. B. NO. 2820 	Page 3 
all the duties of the Authority.  The Authority shall meet at least 
quarterly. 
 
The members of the Authority shall not be entitled to 
compensation for their services, but each member shall be reimbursed 
for travel expenses incurred in performing official duties in 
accordance with the provisions of the State Travel Reimbursement 
Act.  No liability or obligation shall be incurred by the Authority 
beyond the extent to which monies shall have been provided pursuant 
to the authority of this article. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 2820 	Page 4 
Passed the House of Representatives the 7th day of March, 2023. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 19th day of April, 2023. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________