Req. No. 7501 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR HOUSE BILL NO. 2820 By: Kendrix COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE An Act relating to sunset; amending 70 O.S. 2021, Section 23-105, which relates to the Oklahoma Educational Television Authority ; re-creating the authority; and modifying termination date. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 70 O.S. 2021, Section 23 -105, is amended to read as follows: Section 23-105. There is hereby re-created, to continue until July 1, 2023 2026, in accordance with the provisions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law, Section 3901 et seq. of Title 74 of the Oklahoma Statutes, a body corporate and politic to be kn own as the "Oklahoma Educational Television Authority ", and by that name the Authority may sue and be sued, and plead and be impleaded. The Authority is hereby constituted an instrumentality of the state, and the exerci se by the Authority of the powers co nferred by this article for the planning, construction, operation, and maintenance of educational Req. No. 7501 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 television facilities shall be deemed and held to be an essential function of the state. The Oklahoma Educational Televisi on Authority shall consist of thirteen (13) members, including the President of the University of Oklahoma, the President of Oklahoma State University, the State Superintendent of Public Instruction, the Chancell or of the Oklahoma State Regents for Higher Education, the president of one of t he state-supported four-year colleges to be chosen by the presidents of this group of institutions, the president of one of the state - supported two-year colleges to be chosen b y the presidents of this group of institutions, and seven additional members to be appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate, to serve seven-year terms. The appointed members shall have been residents of the state for at least five (5) years preceding the date of their appointment. The appointed members shall inclu de one member from each of the congressional districts and any r emaining members shall be appointed from the state at large. However, when congressional districts are redrawn each member appointed prior to July 1 of the yea r in which such modification bec omes effective shall complete the current term of office and appointments made after July 1 of the year in which such modification becomes effective shall be based on th e redrawn districts. Appointments made after July 1 of the year in which such modification becomes effective shall be from any redrawn districts Req. No. 7501 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 which are not represented by a board an authority member until such time as each of the modified congressional districts are represented by a board an authority member. A majority of the app ointed members shall be actively eng aged in the profession of educatio n. Each appointed member of the Autho rity, before entering upon the duties of the member, shall take the oath provided for by Section 1 of Article XV of the Constitution of the State of Oklahoma. The seven original member s appointed by the Governor shall continue in office for terms expiring on June 30, 1954; June 30, 1955; June 30, 1956; June 30, 1957; June 30, 1958; June 30, 1959; and June 30, 1960, respectively. The terms of each of the original appointed members shall be designated by the Governor, an d said members shall serve for their a ppointed terms and until their respective successors shall be appoi nted and qualified. The successor of each appointed member shall be appointed fo r a term of seven (7) years, except that any person appointed to fill a vacancy shall be appointed to serve only for the unexpired term in said vacancy. The Authority shall el ect from the membership of the Authority a chairman chair, a vice-chairman vice-chair, and a secretary- treasurer. Any such officers e lected by the Authority on or after July 1, 1984, shall be appointed to serve a term of one (1) year. Seven members of the Authority shall constitute a quorum, and the vote of seven members shall be necessary for any action taken by the Req. No. 7501 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 Authority. No vacancy in the membership of the Authority shall impair the right of a quor um to exercise all the rights and perform all the duties of the Authority. The Authority shall meet at least quarterly. The members of the Authority shall not be entitled to compensation for their services, but each member shall be reimbursed for travel expenses incurred in performing official duties in accordance with the provisions of the State Travel Reimbursement Act. No liability or obligation shall be incurred by the Authority beyond the extent to which monies shall have been provided pursuant to the authority of this article. 59-1-7501 LRB 02/16/23