House
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Green (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|