Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2851 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023