Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/06/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Pemberton, Pugh, Seifried, Bergstrom, Green, Thompson (Kristen), Dossett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Dollens, Wallace, Randleman, Ford, McDugle, West (Tammy), Hasenbeck, Baker, Sterling, Boles, Waldron, Schreiber
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Maynard
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|