Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023