Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Banning
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Conley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann, CrosswhiteHader
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|