Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1056 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023