Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Bergstrom, Jech, Coleman, Rader, Haste, Stewart, Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|