Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB108 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2023