House | 05/25/2023 | Veto override message received | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Measure sent to House | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Veto overridden: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Vetoed 04/26/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Daniels |