Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB125 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023