House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Kirt, Garvin, Stewart, Dugger, Hamilton, Rogers, Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dobrinski
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|