Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB141 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023