Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Garvin, Stewart, Bergstrom, Alvord, Seifried, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Townley, Ranson, Alonso-Sandoval, Hefner, Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Pae, Deck, Munson
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Archer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|