Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Amended

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023