Senate | 06/06/2023 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Dempsey (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Seifried |