Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023