Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB292 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023