Senate | 04/27/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Pugh |